blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0069510

EP0069510 - Method of metallizing sintered ceramics materials [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.01.1987
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip13.01.1987No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.03.1987 [1987/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1983/02]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Miyazaki, Kunio
2598-5 Ohkubo-cho
Hitachi-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP
02 / Ookoshi, Yukio
886-2 Motoyoshida-cho
Mito-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP
03 / Kumagai, Akira
1358-2 Tajiri-cho
Hitachi-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP
04 / Suzuki, Hitoshi
863-83 Hakusanwaki Kawajiri-cho
Hitachi-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP
[1983/02]
Representative(s)Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1983/02]Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date82303285.923.06.1982
[1983/02]
Priority number, dateJP1981009898624.06.1981         Original published format: JP 9898681
[1983/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0069510
Date:12.01.1983
Language:EN
[1983/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0069510
Date:26.02.1986
Language:EN
[1986/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.1982
ClassificationIPC:C04B41/88
[1986/09]
CPC:
C04B41/009 (EP,US); C04B37/026 (EP,US); C04B41/5138 (EP,US);
C04B41/88 (EP,US); C04B2237/12 (EP,US); C04B2237/123 (EP,US);
C04B2237/124 (EP,US); C04B2237/343 (EP,US); C04B2237/365 (EP,US);
C04B2237/368 (EP,US); C04B2237/407 (EP,US); C04B2237/555 (EP,US);
C04B2237/708 (EP,US); C04B2237/72 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
C04B41/009, C04B35/00 (US,EP);
C04B41/5138, C04B41/4505 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1983/02]C04B41/14
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1983/02]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Metallisierung von gesinterten keramischen Materialien[1983/02]
English:Method of metallizing sintered ceramics materials[1983/02]
French:Procédé de métallisation de matériaux céramiques frittés[1983/02]
Examination procedure06.08.1982Examination requested  [1983/02]
18.01.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.07.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.02.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
14.08.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.1985Fee for grant paid
23.09.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.11.1986No opposition filed within time limit [1987/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2667432  (NOLTE HENRY J);
 [X]US2702750  (HENRI GEORGE);
 [A]GB850190  (M O VALVE CO LTD);
 [A]US3023492  (BRISTOW ROBERT H);
 [A]US3801363  (BUCK R)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.