EP0069517 - Character display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DATA GENERAL CORPORATION 4400 Computer Drive Westboro Massachusetts 01580 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/02] | For all designated states DATA GENERAL CORPORATION 4400 Computer Drive Westboro Massachusetts 01580 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hunt, Glenn E. 7401 Haddick Circle Austin Texas 78745 / US | 02 /
Lozano, Gerald L. 3407 Sanderling Trail Austin Texas 78746 / US | 03 /
Alexander, Michael C. 1818 South Lakeshore Boulevard Austin Texas 78741 / US | 04 /
Manktelow, Gerald O. 316 Meadow Lea Austin Texas 78745 / US | [1983/02] | Representative(s) | Pears, David Ashley, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [1983/02] | Application number, filing date | 82303342.8 | 25.06.1982 | [1983/02] | Priority number, date | US19810280613 | 06.07.1981 Original published format: US 280613 | [1983/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0069517 | Date: | 12.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0069517 | Date: | 01.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0069517 | Date: | 06.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G09G1/16 | [1983/02] | CPC: |
G09G5/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1983/02] | Title | German: | Zeichenanzeigeeinrichtung | [1983/02] | English: | Character display apparatus | [1983/02] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage de caractères | [1983/02] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 08.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/13] | 02.12.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.10.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 06.01.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1986 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   07.08.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 06.05.1987 | NL | 06.05.1987 | SE | 31.05.1987 | [1999/42] |
Former [1989/18] | NL | 06.05.1987 | |
SE | 31.05.1987 | ||
Former [1988/52] | NL | 06.05.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3754229 (MANBER S); | [X]US4087808 (HERNDON JR LEE R); | [A]US4193071 (HASEGAWA KEIJI [JP], et al) |