EP0068901 - A furnace for melting metal swarf [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MORGANITE CARBON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-3,6-chome Tagawa-dori Higashiyodogawa-ku Osaka / JP | [1983/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takebe, Shinsaku 3-3-6 Midorigaoka Toyonaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1983/01] | Representative(s) | Weston, Walter, et al PHILLIPS & LEIGH 7 Staple Inn Holborn London WC1V 7QF / GB | [1983/01] | Application number, filing date | 82303436.8 | 30.06.1982 | [1983/01] | Priority number, date | JP19810100611 | 30.06.1981 Original published format: JP 10061181 | [1983/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0068901 | Date: | 05.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C22B7/00, C22B21/00, F27B14/14 | [1983/01] | CPC: |
C22B21/0092 (EP);
C22B7/003 (EP);
F27B14/143 (EP);
Y02P10/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/01] | Title | German: | Ofen zum Schmelzen von Metallspänen | [1983/01] | English: | A furnace for melting metal swarf | [1983/01] | French: | Four pour la fusion de copeaux métalliques | [1983/01] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 29.09.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1984/10] | 09.12.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4007036 (GOTTSCHOL HANS-JOACHIM, et al); | [Y]US3770420 (SPEAR R, et al); | [Y]CH118766 (KIENE MAX JUN [CH]); | [Y]US2465545 (KIRTLAND MARSH); | [YD]USRE28382E ; | [A]DE1458171 (NORTH AMERICAN AVIATION INC); | [A]US3933343 (RAWLINGS ROBERT K) |