EP0071351 - A transferred-arc plasma reactor for chemical and metallurgical applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.1986 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYDRO-QUEBEC 75, West Dorchester Boulevard Montreal Québec H2Z 1A4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1985/15] | For all designated states HYDRO-QUEBEC 75, West Dorchester Boulevard Montreal, Québec H2Z 1A4 / CA | ||
Former [1984/30] | For all designated states HYDRO-QUEBEC 75, Boulevard Dorchester Ouest Montréal Québec H2Z 1A4 / CA | ||
Former [1983/06] | For all designated states NORANDA MINES LIMITED P.O. Box 45 Suite 4500 Commerce Court West Toronto Ontario, M5L 1B6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gauvin, William H. 7 Harrow Place Beaconsfield Quebec, H9W 5C7 / CA | 02 /
Kubanek, George R. 86 St.Andrews Road Baie d'Urfe Quebec, H9X 2V1 / CA | [1983/06] | Representative(s) | Eyles, Christopher Thomas, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Eyles, Christopher Thomas, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [1983/06] | Eyles, Christopher Thomas, et al BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London, EC1R 0DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 82303564.7 | 07.07.1982 | [1983/06] | Priority number, date | CA19810382889 | 30.07.1981 Original published format: CA 382889 | [1983/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0071351 | Date: | 09.02.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0071351 | Date: | 23.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C22B4/00, H05H1/34, H05H1/42 | [1983/06] | CPC: |
H05H1/341 (EP,US);
B01J19/088 (EP,US);
C22B4/005 (EP,US);
H05H1/3421 (EP,US);
H05H1/3436 (EP,US);
H05H1/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1983/06] | Title | German: | Plasmareaktor mit übertragendem Lichtbogen zur chemischen und metallurgischen Verwendung | [1983/06] | English: | A transferred-arc plasma reactor for chemical and metallurgical applications | [1983/06] | French: | Réacteur plasmatique à arc transféré pour applications chimiques et métallurgiques | [1983/06] | Examination procedure | 01.08.1983 | Examination requested [1983/41] | 22.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2906858 (MORTON JR HAROLD S); | [AD]US3856918 (SKRIVAN J, et al); | [AD]US3932171 (TYLKO JOZEF KAZIMIERZ); | [AD]US4002466 (MACRAE DONALD R, et al); | [A]US4099958 (MACRAE DONALD R, et al); | [AD]GB2041710 (BETHLEHEM STEEL CORP) | Examination | - JOURNAL OF METALS, vol.33, no.1, January 1981, Warrendale, Penn. (US) W.H. GAUVIN et al.: "The plasma production of ferromolybdenum-Process development and economics", pages 42 to 46 |