EP0070661 - Insulated electromagnetic coil, method and product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/04] | Insulated electromagnetic coil method and product | ||
[1985/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1983/04] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horrigan, Raymond J. deceased / US | [1983/04] | Representative(s) | Wood, Anthony Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1M 7PG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/04] | Wood, Anthony Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 82303625.6 | 09.07.1982 | [1983/04] | Priority number, date | US19810283851 | 16.07.1981 Original published format: US 283851 | [1983/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0070661 | Date: | 26.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0070661 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H02K3/32, H02K15/10, H01F5/06, H01F41/12 | [1983/04] | CPC: |
H02K15/105 (EP,US);
H01F41/122 (EP,US);
H01F41/127 (EP,US);
H01F5/06 (EP,US);
H02K3/325 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24975 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31721 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [1983/04] | Title | German: | Isolierte elektromagnetische Spule, Verfahren und Produkt | [1983/04] | English: | Insulated electromagnetic coil, method and product | [1985/18] | French: | Bobine électromagnétique isolée, procédé et produit | [1983/04] |
Former [1983/04] | Insulated electromagnetic coil method and product | File destroyed: | 25.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 16.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/38] | 27.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1107747 (ALLIS CHALMERS MFG CO); | [A]US3662199 (ANDERSON ROBERT L, et al); | [A]GB1267353 (ENGLISH ELECTRIC CO LTD [GB]) | [A] - ETZ (Elektrotechnische Zeitschrift) Vol. 97, No. 8, 1976, Berlin, "Isolierstoffe" pages 515 to 518 |