EP0071357 - Pharmaceutical and dietary composition when used for enhancement of 1-series PG production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.1986 [1986/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EFAMOL LIMITED 71/74 Mark Lane London E.C.3 / GB | [1983/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horrobin, David Frederick P.O. Box 10 Nuns Island Montreal H3E 1J8 / CA | [1983/06] | Representative(s) | Caro, William Egerton, et al J. MILLER & CO. Lincoln House 296-302 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [1983/06] | Application number, filing date | 82303641.3 | 12.07.1982 | [1983/06] | Priority number, date | GB19810021668 | 14.07.1981 Original published format: GB 8121668 | [1983/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0071357 | Date: | 09.02.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0071357 | Date: | 02.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/20, A61K31/23, A61K45/02, // (A61K31/23, 31:20, 31:07),(A61K45/02, 33:30, 31:485, 31:475, 31:425, 31:40, 31:43, 31:375, 31:23, 31:20, 31:165, 31:13, 31:07, 31:045) | [1983/06] | CPC: |
A61K38/21 (EP);
A61K31/20 (EP);
A61K31/23 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P39/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/23, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/23, A61K31/20, A61K31/07 (EP);
A61K38/21, A61K33/30, A61K31/485, A61K31/475, A61K31/425, A61K31/40, A61K31/43, A61K31/375, A61K31/23, A61K31/20, A61K31/165, A61K31/13, A61K31/07, A61K31/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/06] | Title | German: | Pharmazeutische und diätetische Zusammensetzung zur Erhöhung der Serie-l-Pg-Produktion | [1983/06] | English: | Pharmaceutical and dietary composition when used for enhancement of 1-series PG production | [1983/06] | French: | Composition pharmaceutique et diététique pour augmenter la production de la pg de la série l | [1983/06] | Examination procedure | 04.02.1983 | Examination requested [1983/16] | 22.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.06.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]ZA6701947 ; | [A]EP0019423 (EFAMOL LTD [GB]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 70, no. 18, 5th May 1969, page 252, column 2, no. 80843k, Columbus Ohio (USA); & ZA - A - 67 01 947 (LATSKY, JOHAN M.) (15-05-1968), & ZA6701947 A 00000000 |