EP0072684 - Adhesive quaternary ammonium polymer compositions, use of them in bonding flexible covering to rigid substrate, and laminated articles produced therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.1986 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY Independence Mall West Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19105 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/08] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY Independence Mall West Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Plamondon, Joseph Edward 55 Mill Creek Road Holland Pennsylvania 18966 / US | 02 /
Moberly, John Albert 7813 Farnsworth Street Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19152 / US | [1983/08] | Representative(s) | Angell, David Whilton, et al ROHM AND HAAS European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon CR9 3NB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/17] | Angell, David Whilton, et al ROHM AND HAAS European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon CR9 3NB / GB | ||
Former [1983/08] | Angell, David Whilton Rohm and Haas Company Patent Department Chesterfield House Bloomsbury Way London WC1A 2TP / GB | Application number, filing date | 82304291.6 | 13.08.1982 | [1983/08] | Priority number, date | US19810293829 | 18.08.1981 Original published format: US 293829 | [1983/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0072684 | Date: | 23.02.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C09J3/14, C08J5/04, C08J5/12, B32B5/18, B32B17/04, B60R13/02 | [1983/08] | CPC: |
B32B27/04 (EP);
B32B5/245 (US);
B29C66/45 (EP);
B32B5/18 (US);
B32B7/12 (US);
C09J133/06 (EP);
B29C51/262 (EP);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
B29C66/71 (EP);
B32B2262/101 (US);
B32B2266/0278 (US);
B32B2429/00 (US);
B32B2605/00 (US);
B60R13/0225 (EP);
B60R13/0815 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C09J133/06, C08L2666/04 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2075/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/08] | Title | German: | Klebende quaternäre Ammonium-Polymerzusammensetzungen, deren Verwendung zum Verbinden einer flexiblen Deckschicht mit einer harten Unterlage und Schichtstoffe hergestellt mit derselben | [1983/08] | English: | Adhesive quaternary ammonium polymer compositions, use of them in bonding flexible covering to rigid substrate, and laminated articles produced therewith | [1983/08] | French: | Compositions adhésives de polymère quaternaire d'ammonium, leur utilisation pour lier une couche flexible à un substrat rigide, et articles à plusieurs couches fabriqués avec celles-ci | [1983/08] | File destroyed: | 03.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 08.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/38] | 16.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.06.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/37] | 15.04.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1986/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.09.1985 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3291679 [ ] (O'BRIEN JOSEPH P); | US3678098 [ ] (LEWIS SHELDON N, et al); | GB1495241 [ ] (KYORITSU YUKI CO LTD, et al); | DE2655090 [ ] (KALK CHEMISCHE FABRIK GMBH); | DE2831640 [ ] (DLW AG); | US4200562 [ ] (OKADA KAORU [JP], et al) |