EP0073600 - Shielded assembly having capacitive coupling feature [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.10.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED (a New Jersey corporation) P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/10] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED (a New Jersey corporation) P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asick, John Carl 1038 Pennsylvania Avenue Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17111 / US | 02 /
Ritchie, Leon Thomas 1447 Stewart Boulevard Clearwater Florida 33516 / US | 03 /
Snyder, Clair Wilson, Jr. R.D. 11, Box 511 York Pennsylvania 17406 / US | [1983/10] | Representative(s) | Gray, Robin Oliver, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | [1983/52] |
Former [1983/10] | Terrell, Thomas Gwyn 20 Queensmere Slough Berkshire SL1 1YZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 82304347.6 | 18.08.1982 | [1983/10] | Priority number, date | US19810297543 | 31.08.1981 Original published format: US 297543 | [1983/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0073600 | Date: | 09.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0073600 | Date: | 11.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/66, H01R13/658 | [1983/10] | CPC: |
H01R13/7195 (EP,US);
H01R13/65912 (EP,US);
H01R13/6593 (EP,US);
H01R13/6583 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/10] | Title | German: | Radiofrequenz-abgeschirmter Zusammenbau mit kapazitiven Kupplungseigenschaften | [1983/10] | English: | Shielded assembly having capacitive coupling feature | [1983/10] | French: | Ensemble blindé contre la fréquence radio ayant un moyen de couplage capacitif | [1983/10] | File destroyed: | 19.04.1993 | Examination procedure | 06.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/08] | 04.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1987/47] | 08.06.1987 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1987/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3573677 (DETAR DONALD R); | [Y]GB943571 (ELECTROLUX AB); | [Y]US4205891 (DUFFANY ROBERT J [US], et al); | [A]FR1278799 (EGEN ELECTRIC LTD); | [A]FR777747 ; | [AD]US4206962 (DOUTY GEORGE H [US], et al) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 15, no. 1, June 1972, pages 34,35, New York (USA); |