EP0076569 - Electroplating arrangements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.07.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2015 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMI Limited Blyth Road Hayes Middlesex, UB3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/15] | For all designated states EMI Limited Blyth Road Hayes Middlesex, UB3 1BP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnston, Samuel James Blair 5, Goffs Road Ashford Middlesex / GB | [1983/15] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [1983/15] | Marsh, Robin Geoffrey THORN EMI Patents Limited Central Research Laboratories Dawley Road Hayes, Middlesex UB3 1HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 82304634.7 | 02.09.1982 | [1983/15] | Priority number, date | GB19810029625 | 01.10.1981 Original published format: GB 8129625 | [1983/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0076569 | Date: | 13.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0076569 | Date: | 27.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C25D1/10, C25D5/08 | [1983/15] | CPC: |
C25D1/10 (EP,US);
C25D5/08 (EP,US);
C25D5/611 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1983/15] | Title | German: | Elektroplattierungsvorrichtung | [1983/15] | English: | Electroplating arrangements | [1983/15] | French: | Dispositif d'électroplacage | [1983/15] | Examination procedure | 01.08.1983 | Examination requested [1983/41] | 10.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.05.1987
10.06.1987
INADMISSIBLE Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL Opponent's representative Weening, Cornelis INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2015/17] |
Former [1987/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.05.1987
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL Opponent's representative Weening, Cornelis INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 03.09.1987 | NL | 01.04.1988 | FR | 31.05.1988 | DE | 01.06.1988 | GB | 21.11.1988 | [2000/03] |
Former [1998/51] | SE | 03.09.1987 | |
NL | 01.04.1988 | ||
FR | 31.05.1988 | ||
DE | 01.06.1988 | ||
Former [1992/36] | SE | 03.09.1987 | |
NL | 01.04.1988 | ||
DE | 01.06.1988 | ||
Former [1989/19] | SE | 03.09.1987 | |
NL | 01.04.1988 | ||
Former [1989/10] | NL | 01.04.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1503553 (PATHE MARCONI IND MUSIC); | [A]EP0020008 (EMI LTD [GB]); | [A]US2675348 (LAWRENCE GREENSPAN) |