EP0074769 - Recognition of speech or speech-like sounds using associative memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.09.1987 [1987/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPUTER BASIC TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH ASSOCIATION 4-28 Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/12] | For all designated states COMPUTER BASIC TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH ASSOCIATION 4-28 Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Togawa, Fumio 2271 Narasaka-cho Nara-shi Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Atsuo 313 Higashi Midorigaoka Kuramoto-machi Nabari-shi Mie-ken / JP | [1983/12] | Representative(s) | Wright, Peter David John, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [1983/12] | Application number, filing date | 82304648.7 | 03.09.1982 | [1983/12] | Priority number, date | JP19810140525 | 04.09.1981 Original published format: JP 14052581 | [1983/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0074769 | Date: | 23.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0074769 | Date: | 17.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G10L5/00 | [1986/38] | CPC: |
G10L15/00 (EP,US);
G10L25/15 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/12] | G10L1/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/12] | Title | German: | Erkennung von Sprache oder sprachähnlichen Lauten unter Anwendung eines assoziativen Speichers | [1983/12] | English: | Recognition of speech or speech-like sounds using associative memory | [1983/12] | French: | Reconnaissance de la parole ou de sons similaires utilisant une mémoire associative | [1983/12] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/47] | 27.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.02.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2552437 (WILLWACHER GERD DIPL ING) | [Y] - 1978 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH & SIGNAL PROCESSING, TULSA, 10th-12th April 1978, pages 735-738, IEEE, New York (USA); |