EP0102429 - Compound die assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.1987 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.12.1987 [1987/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iwata, Tetsutaro 15, Tamura-cho 3-chome Ichinoseki-shi Iwata-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/11] | For all designated states Iwata, Tetsutaro 15, Tamura-cho 3-chome Ichinoseki-shi Iwata-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwata, Satoshi 23-5, Nakameguro 3-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [1984/11] | Representative(s) | Coleman, Stanley, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | [1984/11] | Application number, filing date | 82304671.9 | 06.09.1982 | [1984/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0102429 | Date: | 14.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0102429 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B21D28/14, B21D37/20 | [1984/11] | CPC: |
B21D28/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT [1984/11] | Title | German: | Verbundwerkzeug | [1984/11] | English: | Compound die assembly | [1984/11] | French: | Outillage composé | [1984/11] | Examination procedure | 18.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/31] | 09.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2505667 ; | [Y]CH564386 ; | [Y]DE2357519 ; | [Y]CH325224 ; | [A]US1543010 ; | [A]DE2144085 ; | [A]US3125917 |