EP0074273 - Hydrocarbon resin and modified hydrocarbon resin product thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.1987 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.10.1987 [1987/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/11] | For all designated states MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mizui, Kinya 2-4 Misono 1-chome Otake-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | 02 /
Takeda, Masami 2-6, Misono 1-chome Otake-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | 03 /
Iwata, Tadao 114-16, Minamioyumi-cho Chiba-shi Chiba-ken / JP | [1983/11] | Representative(s) | Geering, Keith Edwin, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/11] | Geering, Keith Edwin, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 82304689.1 | 07.09.1982 | [1983/11] | Priority number, date | JP19810140738 | 07.09.1981 Original published format: JP 14073881 | [1983/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0074273 | Date: | 16.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0074273 | Date: | 05.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C08F232/08, C08F210/00, C08F240/00, C08F8/04, C08F8/46, C09J3/14, C09D3/733 | [1983/11] | CPC: |
C09J145/00 (EP,US);
C08F232/08 (EP,US);
C08F240/00 (EP,US);
C08F8/46 (EP,US);
C09D145/00 (EP,US);
C09D5/004 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F8/46, C08F240/00 (EP,US);
C09J121/00, C08L2666/06 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/11] | Title | German: | Kohlenwasserstoffharz und daraus modifiziertes Kohlenwasserstoffharz | [1983/11] | English: | Hydrocarbon resin and modified hydrocarbon resin product thereof | [1983/11] | French: | Résine hydrocarbonée et produit en résine hydrocarbonée modifiée obtenu | [1983/11] | Examination procedure | 12.08.1983 | Examination requested [1983/42] | 16.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.03.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2027578 ; | [A]FR2290457 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [A]GB880904 (DUNLOP RUBBER CO) |