EP0078102 - Polycrystalline silicon-bonded cubic boron nitride body and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.1986 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1983/18] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Minyoung 1133 Glenmeadow Court Schenectady New York 12309 / US | 02 /
Szala, Lawrence Edward 65 Charlton Road Scotia New York 12302 / US | [1983/18] | Representative(s) | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/18] | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 82304698.2 | 08.09.1982 | [1983/18] | Priority number, date | US19810315332 | 26.10.1981 Original published format: US 315332 | [1983/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0078102 | Date: | 04.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0078102 | Date: | 27.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0078102 | Date: | 29.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/58, C22C29/00 | [1983/18] | CPC: |
B29C43/10 (EP,US);
B22F3/26 (EP,US);
B24D18/00 (EP,US);
B24D18/0009 (EP,US);
B24D18/0027 (EP,US);
B24D3/06 (EP,US);
C04B35/5831 (EP,US);
B29C2043/106 (EP,US);
B29C2043/3628 (EP,US);
B29K2303/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1983/18] | Title | German: | Polykristalliner mit Silicium gebundener Formkörper aus kubischem Bornitrid und Verfahren | [1983/18] | English: | Polycrystalline silicon-bonded cubic boron nitride body and method | [1983/18] | French: | Corps polycristallin de nitrure de bore cubique lié par du silicium et procédé | [1983/18] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 23.01.1984 | Examination requested [1984/14] | 20.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.07.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4117968 (NAIDICH JURY VLADIMIROVICH, et al); | [Y]EP0010257 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [Y]DE3044945 (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD [JP]) |