EP0075445 - Method and apparatus for pressing glass articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.1986 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.1987 [1987/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CORNING GLASS WORKS Houghton Park Corning New York 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/13] | For all designated states Corning Glass Works Houghton Park Corning New York 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Elmer Leonard P.O. Box 515 Corning New York, 14830 / US | 02 /
Goodrich, Kenneth LaRue R.D. No. 1 Beaver Dams New York, 14812 / US | 03 /
Hillman, Robert Charles R.D. No. 1, Box 75 Rock Stream New York, 14878 / US | [1983/13] | Representative(s) | Boon, Graham Anthony, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/13] | Boon, Graham Anthony, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 82304881.4 | 16.09.1982 | [1983/13] | Priority number, date | US19810303002 | 17.09.1981 Original published format: US 303002 | [1983/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0075445 | Date: | 30.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0075445 | Date: | 29.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C03B23/035, C03B11/00, C03B23/025, C03B23/03 | [1983/13] | CPC: |
C03B23/0357 (EP,US);
C03B11/06 (EP,US);
C03B11/07 (EP,US);
C03B21/02 (EP,US);
C03B23/0302 (EP,US);
C03B23/0305 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1983/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Pressen von Glasgegenständen | [1983/13] | English: | Method and apparatus for pressing glass articles | [1983/13] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour presser des articles de verre | [1983/13] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 25.08.1983 | Examination requested [1983/44] | 07.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.07.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3193367 (GIFFEN JAMES W); | [AD]US3582454 (GIFFEN JAMES W); | [A]GB1538118 (RUUSKANEN T) | Examination | US3114620 | US3231356 |