blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0076073

EP0076073 - Granular moulding compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1983/14]Moulding compositions
[1986/09]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  28.04.1990
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.09.2009  [2009/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCOTT BADER COMPANY LIMITED
Wollaston Wellingborough
Northamptonshire NN9 7RL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1983/14]For all designated states
SCOTT BADER COMPANY LIMITED
Wollaston
Wellingborough Northamptonshire NN9 7RL / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Osborne, Trevor Richard
103 Vicarage Farm Road
Wellingborough Northants / GB
[1983/14]
Representative(s)Harrison, David Christopher, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]Harrison, David Christopher, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London
EC2V 8AS / GB
Former [1983/14]Harrison, David Christopher, et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date82304937.420.09.1982
[1983/14]
Priority number, dateGB1981002902925.09.1981         Original published format: GB 8129029
[1983/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0076073
Date:06.04.1983
Language:EN
[1983/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0076073
Date:26.02.1986
Language:EN
[1986/09]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0076073
Date:13.06.1990
Language:EN
[1990/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.02.1983
ClassificationIPC:C08G63/54, C08L67/06
[1983/14]
CPC:
C08G63/54 (EP,US); C08K3/013 (EP,US)
C-Set:
C08K3/013, C08L67/06 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1986/09]
Former [1983/14]BE,  CH,  DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Granulierte Formmassen[1986/09]
English:Granular moulding compositions[1986/09]
French:Masses à mouler granulaires[1986/09]
Former [1983/14]Formmassen
Former [1983/14]Moulding compositions
Former [1983/14]Masses à mouler
Examination procedure30.07.1983Examination requested  [1983/40]
08.11.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
22.08.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.10.1985Fee for grant paid
05.10.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.11.1986  07.03.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Naamloze Vennootschap DSM
Het Overloon 1
NL-6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Opponent's representative
Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis R.
DSM Patents & Trademarks
Office Geleen
Postbus 9
6160 MA Geleen / NL
 [N/P]
Former [1987/03]
Opponent(s)01  26.11.1986  07.03.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Naamloze Vennootschap DSM
Het Overloon 1
NL-6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Opponent's representative
Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis Roeland
OCTROOIBUREAU DSM Postbus 9
NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL
10.03.1987Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.08.1987Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.08.1987Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
20.11.1987Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
04.04.1989Date of oral proceedings
09.06.1989Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.08.1989Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.08.1989Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.01.1990Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
14.03.1990Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.09.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
19.09.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JP74100194  ;
 [X]JP74102773  ;
 [X]DE1469895  (ALBERT AG CHEM WERKE);
 [X]GB823755  (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO);
 [X]FR2329712  (SIR SOC ITALIANA RESINE SPA [IT])
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 82, no. 12, 24th March 1975, page 30, no. 73872p, Columbus Ohio (USA); & JP - A - 74 100 194 (TOYOBO CO., LTD.) (21-09-1974), & JP74100194 A 00000000
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 82, no. 12, 16th June 1975, page 47, no. 157329e, Columbus Ohio (USA); & JP - A - 74 102 773 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD.) (27-09-1974), & JP74102773 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.