EP0076619 - Heat transfer between processing rolls and sheet film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/15] | Improved heat transfer between processing rolls and sheet film | ||
[1985/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1986 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.04.1986 [1986/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/15] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Levy, Stanley Burton 632 Kilburn Road Wilmington Delaware 19803 / US | [1983/15] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/15] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 82305110.7 | 28.09.1982 | [1983/15] | Priority number, date | US19810306734 | 29.09.1981 Original published format: US 306734 | [1983/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0076619 | Date: | 13.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0076619 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B29C51/42 | [1985/19] | CPC: |
B29C55/06 (EP,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B29C48/914 (EP,US);
B29C48/915 (EP,US);
B29C48/9175 (EP,US);
B29C48/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1983/15] | B29D7/22 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1983/15] | Title | German: | Wärmeübertragung zwischen Formwalzen und einer Folienbahn | [1983/15] | English: | Heat transfer between processing rolls and sheet film | [1985/19] | French: | Transfert de chaleur entre des cylindres de formation et une feuille continue | [1983/15] |
Former [1983/15] | Improved heat transfer between processing rolls and sheet film | Examination procedure | 15.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/47] | 09.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.09.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1704052 [ ] (CROWN ZELLERBACH CORP); | DE1704920 [ ] (POLYMER SYNTHESE WERK); | US3842152 [ ] (WITFIELD H, et al); | DE2460663 [ ] |