Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
16.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.1986 [1986/49] |
18.10.1985 | (Expected) grant | published on 18.12.1985 [1985/51] |
27.07.1983 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.09.1983 [1983/39] |
11.02.1983 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.04.1983 [1983/15] |