Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0076639 | Global Dossier | 18.12.1985 | B1 | EP0076639 | 13.04.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP15559281 | 29.09.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3268047D1 | 30.01.1986 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP15559281 | 29.09.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS5855450 | 01.04.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | JP15559281 | 29.09.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4478753 | 23.10.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | JP15559281 | 29.09.1981 |