EP0080799 - Electrodeless light source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1988 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.06.1988 [1988/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GTE Laboratories Incorporated 100 W. 10th Street Wilmington Delaware / US | For all designated states GTE Products Corporation 100 West 10th Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/23] | For all designated states GTE Laboratories Incorporated 100 W. 10th Street Wilmington Delaware / US | ||
For all designated states GTE Products Corporation 100 West 10th Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Proud, Joseph M. 347, Linden Street Wellisley Hills Massachusetts 02181 / US | 02 /
Lapatovich, Walter P. 75, Myrtle Street Watertown Massachusetts 02172 / US | 03 /
Johnson, Stephen G. 8, Marlboro Road Georgetown Massachusetts 01833 / US | [1983/23] | Representative(s) | Bubb, Antony John Allen, et al Wilson Gunn Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/23] | Bubb, Antony John Allen, et al Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 82305192.5 | 30.09.1982 | [1983/23] | Priority number, date | US19810307568 | 01.10.1981 Original published format: US 307568 | [1983/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0080799 | Date: | 08.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0080799 | Date: | 02.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0080799 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H01J65/04 | [1983/23] | CPC: |
H01J65/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1983/23] | Title | German: | Elektrodenlose Lichtquelle | [1983/23] | English: | Electrodeless light source | [1983/23] | French: | Source lumineuse sans électrode | [1983/23] | Examination procedure | 25.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/28] | 13.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.12.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4254363 (WALSH PETER); | [A]US3319119 (RENDINA JOHN F); | [A]GB1028228 ; | [A]US3444415 (SKIRVIN CLIFFORD D); | [A]GB1165376 (SYLVANIA ELECTRIC PROD [US]); | [A]US2732513 |