EP0082587 - Preparation of storage-stable serum [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1986 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1987 [1987/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECHNICON INSTRUMENTS CORPORATION (a New York corporation) 511 Benedict Avenue Tarrytown New York 10591 / US | [1983/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Engler, Phillip V. 21 Maple Street Tarrytown New York 10591 / US | 02 /
Buhl, Steven N. 4 South Delaware Drive Nyack New York 10960 / US | [1983/26] | Representative(s) | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/26] | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 82305441.6 | 13.10.1982 | [1983/26] | Priority number, date | US19810325791 | 30.11.1981 Original published format: US 325791 | [1983/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0082587 | Date: | 29.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0082587 | Date: | 22.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/96, A61K35/16 | [1983/26] | CPC: |
G01N33/96 (EP,US);
A61K35/16 (EP,US);
G01N2496/05 (EP,US);
Y10S436/825 (EP,US);
Y10T436/10 (EP,US);
Y10T436/106664 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/26] | Title | German: | Herstellung von lagerstabilem Serum | [1983/26] | English: | Preparation of storage-stable serum | [1983/26] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un sérum stable au stockage | [1983/26] | Examination procedure | 09.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/04] | 08.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.07.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2353035 (BEHRINGWERKE AG); | [X]DE2442680 (BEHRINGWERKE AG); | [X]US3955925 (PROKSCH GARY J, et al); | [X]EP0019939 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]DE2927841 (BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS INC); | [A]US4007008 (BECKER MILTON J, et al) |