EP0078647 - Method and apparatus for suppressing water-solid over-pressurization of coolant in nuclear reactor power apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.05.1988 [1988/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building, Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/19] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aanstad, Ola Jarleiv Vestie Vei 77 N-1315 Nesoya / NO | 02 /
Sklencar, Albert Michael 1181 Cascade Drive West Homestead Pennsylvania / US | [1983/19] | Representative(s) | Van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 30 The Green Calne Wiltshire SN11 8DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/19] | van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 23, Centre Heights London NW3 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 82305652.8 | 25.10.1982 | [1983/19] | Priority number, date | US19810318233 | 04.11.1981 Original published format: US 318233 | [1983/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0078647 | Date: | 11.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0078647 | Date: | 11.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0078647 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G21D3/04, G21D9/00, G21D3/00 | [1987/17] | CPC: |
G21D3/04 (EP,US);
G21D3/08 (KR);
Y02E30/00 (EP);
Y02E30/30 (US)
|
Former IPC [1984/15] | G21D3/04, G21D9/00, G21D3/00 | ||
Former IPC [1983/19] | G21D3/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, IT, LI, SE [1983/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verringern des kritischen Überdrucks des Kühlmittels in Kernkraftwerken | [1983/19] | English: | Method and apparatus for suppressing water-solid over-pressurization of coolant in nuclear reactor power apparatus | [1983/19] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la suppression de la surpression critique de fluide caloriporteur dans une centrale nucléaire | [1983/19] | Examination procedure | 10.10.1984 | Examination requested [1984/51] | 28.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.10.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/18] | Request for further processing for: | 12.04.1986 | Request for further processing filed | 27.03.1986 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.05.1986 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4104117 [ ] (PARZIALE ERNEST A, et al); | US3533764 [ ] (TOGNERI MAURO G); | US4080251 [ ] (MUSICK CHARLES RONALD); | US4102394 [ ] (BOTTS ELTON M) |