EP0078662 - An automatic door opening and closing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.05.1988 [1988/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OHI SEISAKUSHO CO., LTD. 1-14-7 Maruyama Tsurumi-ku Yokohama / JP | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/19] | For all designated states OHI SEISAKUSHO CO., LTD. 1-14-7 Maruyama Tsurumi-ku Yokohama / JP | ||
For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moriya, Masaichi 14-4-202 Tsurugadai Chigasaki Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Takaishi, Tatsuyuki 790-14 Aza Yamada Isogo-cho Isogo-ku Yokohama / JP | 03 /
Mochida, Haruo 6-1 Daikoku-cho Tsurumi-ku Yokohama / JP | 04 /
Takeda, Yoshimitsu 6-1 Daikoku-cho Tsurumi-ku Yokohama / JP | [1983/19] | Representative(s) | Bubb, Antony John Allen, et al Wilson Gunn Chancery House, Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/19] | Bubb, Antony John Allen, et al GEE & CO. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 82305711.2 | 27.10.1982 | [1983/19] | Priority number, date | JP19810172152 | 29.10.1981 Original published format: JP 17215281 | [1983/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0078662 | Date: | 11.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0078662 | Date: | 15.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0078662 | Date: | 20.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/12 | [1983/19] | CPC: |
E05B81/20 (EP,US);
E05F15/603 (EP,US);
E05F15/611 (EP,US);
E05F15/63 (EP,US);
E05B81/21 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/216 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/246 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/434 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/462 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/19] | Title | German: | Automatische Türöffnungs- und schliesseinrichtung | [1983/19] | English: | An automatic door opening and closing device | [1983/19] | French: | Dispositif d'ouverture et de fermeture automatique de porte | [1983/19] | Examination procedure | 31.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/12] | 25.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.11.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1077146 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD); | [Y]US3343303 (WANLASS BERT R) |