Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
27.01.1987 | Refusal of application | published on 18.03.1987 [1987/12] |
18.11.1983 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.01.1984 [1984/03] |
31.03.1983 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.06.1983 [1983/22] |