EP0079704 - Pinless haulage drive chain and rack-form link for use seriatim in forming same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1986 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.02.1991 [1991/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANDERSON STRATHCLYDE PLC Anderson House 47 Broad Street Glasgow, G40 2QW Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/21] | For all designated states ANDERSON STRATHCLYDE PLC Anderson House 47 Broad Street Glasgow, G40 2QW Scotland / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hogg, Thomas Morrow 5 Mossland Drive Wishaw Lanarkshire Scotland / GB | [1983/26] |
Former [1983/21] | 01 /
Hogg, Thomas Morrow 3 Hillfoot Crescent Wishaw Lanarkshire Scotland / GB | Representative(s) | Huskisson, Frank Mackie, et al FITZPATRICKS 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/05] | Huskisson, Frank Mackie, et al FITZPATRICKS 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS Scotland / GB | ||
Former [1983/21] | Huskisson, Frank Mackie FITZPATRICKS 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 82305722.9 | 28.10.1982 | [1983/21] | Priority number, date | GB19810032885 | 31.10.1981 Original published format: GB 8132885 | [1983/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0079704 | Date: | 25.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0079704 | Date: | 26.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | E21C29/02 | [1983/21] | CPC: |
E21C29/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/21] | Title | German: | Bolzenlose Vorschubkette und Zahnstangenförmiges Element zum aufeinanderfolgenden Zusammenfügen der Kette | [1985/26] | English: | Pinless haulage drive chain and rack-form link for use seriatim in forming same | [1983/21] | French: | Chaîne sans boulons pour entraînement le long d'une voie de roulage et élément de crémaillère pour composer successivement ladite chaîne | [1985/26] |
Former [1983/21] | Bolzenlose Zahnstange für Antrieb entlang einer Förderstrecke und Element zum aufeinanderfolgenden Zusammenfügen der Zahnstange | ||
Former [1983/21] | Crémaillère sans boulons pour entraînement le long d'une voie de roulage et élément pour composer successivement ladite crémaillère | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 13.10.1983 | Examination requested [1983/52] | 24.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.12.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2721867 (EICKHOFF GEB); | [Y]DE2805799 ; | [Y]DE3011350 (KLOECKNER WERKE AG [DE]); | [Y]DE7424425U ; | [Y]GB1489625 (BECORIT GRUBENAUSBAU GMBH); | [Y]GB2073286 (GEWERK EISENHUETTE WESTFALIA) |