EP0080812 - Programmable sound circuit for electronic games [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.1987 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BALLY MANUFACTURING CORPORATION 2640 West Belmont Avenue Chicago Illinois 60618 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/23] | For all designated states BALLY MANUFACTURING CORPORATION 2640 West Belmont Avenue Chicago Illinois 60618 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vickers, Eral Corban 3132 Howthorne Street Franklin Park Illinois / US | [1983/23] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/23] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 82305847.4 | 03.11.1982 | [1983/23] | Priority number, date | US19810325233 | 27.11.1981 Original published format: US 325233 | [1983/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0080812 | Date: | 08.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0080812 | Date: | 27.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G10H1/12, H03H19/00 | [1983/23] | CPC: |
G10H1/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/23] | Title | German: | Programmierbare Tonschaltung für elektronische Spiele | [1983/23] | English: | Programmable sound circuit for electronic games | [1983/23] | French: | Circuit de son programmable pour jeux électroniques | [1983/23] | File destroyed: | 26.04.1993 | Examination procedure | 26.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/30] | 08.01.1987 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1987/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2018080 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]US4173915 (GROSS GLENN M [US]); | [Y]EP0017341 (WILLIAMS ELECTRONICS INC [US]) |