Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
22.01.1987 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.03.1987 [1987/11] |
05.06.1986 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.07.1986 [1986/30] |
23.10.1985 | Publication of search report | published on 27.12.1985 [1985/52] |
11.04.1983 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.06.1983 [1983/23] |