EP0080316 - Scribing device for forming arcuate figures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.1985 [1985/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Witt, Gerald R. 2221 Oneida Salt Lake City Utah 84109 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/22] | For all designated states Witt, Gerald R. 2221 Oneida Salt Lake City Utah 84109 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/22] | Representative(s) | Geldard, David Guthrie, et al URQUHART-DYKES AND LORD 5th Floor, Tower House Merrion Way Leeds, LS2 8PB West Yorkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/22] | Geldard, David Guthrie, et al URQUHART-DYKES AND LORD 5th Floor, Tower House Merrion Way Leeds, LS2 8PB West Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 82306090.0 | 16.11.1982 | [1983/22] | Priority number, date | US19810322753 | 19.11.1981 Original published format: US 322753 | [1983/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0080316 | Date: | 01.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0080316 | Date: | 20.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B43L11/04 | [1983/22] | CPC: |
B43L11/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI, SE [1983/22] | Title | German: | Gerät zum Zeichnen von gebogenen Abbildungen | [1983/22] | English: | Scribing device for forming arcuate figures | [1983/22] | French: | Dispositif à dessiner des figures courbées | [1983/22] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 20.02.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/36] | 20.03.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1985/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.12.1984 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1984 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2670540 ; | [A]US4182043 ; | [A]DE387156 ; | [A]US3311981 |