EP0082609 - Chemical reactor and process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1988 [1988/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1983/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dobson, Brian 7 Manor Garth Kirklevington Yarm Cleveland / GB | 02 /
Whyman, Peter John Michael Chorley The Grove Hutton Rudby Yarm Cleveland / GB | 03 /
Doy, Ralph Jones Lulworth Greta Street Saltburn-by-the-Sea Cleveland / GB | 04 /
Engel, Manfred Otto 1 Knayton Grove Fairfield Stockton-on-Tees Cleveland / GB | 05 /
Davies, Raymond 8 Spitalfields Yarm Cleveland / GB | [1983/26] | Representative(s) | Locke, Timothy John, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/26] | Locke, Timothy John, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 82306324.3 | 26.11.1982 | [1983/26] | Priority number, date | GB19810037683 | 14.12.1981 Original published format: GB 8137683 | [1983/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0082609 | Date: | 29.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0082609 | Date: | 14.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/02, C07D301/10 | [1983/26] | CPC: |
B01J8/0285 (EP,US);
B01J8/0005 (EP,US);
B01J8/0214 (EP,US);
C07D301/10 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00132 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1983/26] | Title | German: | Chemischer Reaktor und Verfahren | [1983/26] | English: | Chemical reactor and process | [1983/26] | French: | Réacteur chimique et procédé | [1983/26] | Examination procedure | 25.10.1983 | Examination requested [1984/01] | 16.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE719652 (MANNESMANN AG); | [A]US2744813 (HERBERT PAUL); | [XD]GB2046618 (TOYO ENGINEERING CORP) |