EP0081980 - Systems for determining the efficiency of fossil fuel-fired vapour generators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.1987 [1987/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BABCOCK & WILCOX COMPANY 1010 Common Street, P.O. Box 60035 New Orleans Louisiana 70160 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/25] | For all designated states THE BABCOCK & WILCOX COMPANY 1010 Common Street, P.O. Box 60035 New Orleans, Louisiana 70160 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnson, Ralph K. 652 Lander Drive Highland Heights Ohio 44143 / US | 02 /
Keyes, Marion A. 120 Riverstone Drive Chagrin Falls Ohio 44022 / US | 03 /
Kaya, Azmi 2365 Woodpark Road Akron Ohio 44313 / US | 04 /
Moss, William H. 34996 N. Turtle Trail Willoughby Ohio 44094 / US | [1983/25] | Representative(s) | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/25] | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 82306582.6 | 09.12.1982 | [1983/25] | Priority number, date | US19810329538 | 10.12.1981 Original published format: US 329538 | [1983/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0081980 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0081980 | Date: | 16.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0081980 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F23M11/04 | [1983/25] | CPC: |
F23N5/003 (EP);
F23M11/047 (EP);
G01N33/0032 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/25] | Title | German: | Anlagen zur Ermittlung des Wirkungsgrades von mit Fossilen Brennstoffen beheizten Dampfkesseln | [1983/25] | English: | Systems for determining the efficiency of fossil fuel-fired vapour generators | [1983/25] | French: | Systèmes pour la détermination du rendement des chaudières à vapeur chauffées par des combustibles fossiles | [1983/25] | Examination procedure | 09.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/16] | 24.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.07.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/09] | Request for further processing for: | 30.01.1985 | Request for further processing filed | 30.01.1985 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.02.1985 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2016707 ; | [A]GB510525 ; | [A]US2723559 ; | [A]US1591444 |