EP0083489 - Membrane systems for filtration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/28] | Improved membrane system and process therefor | ||
[1989/16] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 29.11.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRUNSWICK CORPORATION One Brunswick Plaza Skokie Illinois 60077 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/28] | For all designated states BRUNSWICK CORPORATION One Brunswick Plaza Skokie Illinois 60077 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wrasidlo, Wolfgang J. 1219 Coast Boulevard La Jolla California 92037 / US | 02 /
Mysels, Karol J. 8327 Scenic Drive La Jolla California 92037 / US | [1983/28] | Representative(s) | Allden, Thomas Stanley, et al A.A. Thornton & CO. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/28] | Allden, Thomas Stanley, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 82306759.0 | 17.12.1982 | [1983/28] | Priority number, date | US19820336565 | 04.01.1982 Original published format: US 336565 | [1983/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0083489 | Date: | 13.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0083489 | Date: | 18.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0083489 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B01D13/00, B01D13/04 | [1983/28] | CPC: |
B01D69/12 (EP,US);
B01D46/12 (EP);
B01D61/145 (EP);
B01D61/147 (EP);
B01D63/06 (EP,US);
B01D63/10 (EP,US);
B01D63/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1983/28] | Title | German: | Membransysteme zur Filtration | [1989/16] | English: | Membrane systems for filtration | [1989/16] | French: | Systèmes de membrane pour filtration | [1989/16] |
Former [1983/28] | Membransystem und Verfahren zu seiner Anwendung | ||
Former [1983/28] | Improved membrane system and process therefor | ||
Former [1983/28] | Système de membrane et procédé de son utilisation | Examination procedure | 30.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/33] | 27.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.1989
09.02.1990
ADMISSIBLE Enka AG Enka-Haus Kasinostrasse Postfach 10 01 49 D-42001 Wuppertal / DE | 02
17.01.1990
28.02.1990
ADMISSIBLE Firma SEITZ-FILTER-WERKE GmbH und Co. Postfach 23 63 D-55512 Bad Kreuznach / DE Opponent's representative Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB, et al, et al Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.1989
09.02.1990
ADMISSIBLE Enka AG Enka-Haus Kasinostrasse Postfach 10 01 49 D-42001 Wuppertal / DE | ||
02
17.01.1990
28.02.1990
ADMISSIBLE Firma SEITZ-FILTER-WERKE GmbH und Co. Postfach 23 63 D-55512 Bad Kreuznach / DE Opponent's representative Dr. Fuchs, Dr. Luderschmidt Dr. Mehler, Dipl.-Ing Weiss Patentanwälte, et al, et al Postfach 46 60 D-65036 Wiesbaden / DE | |||
Former [1990/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.1989
09.02.1990
ADMISSIBLE Enka AG Enka-Haus Kasinostrasse Postfach 10 01 49 D-42001 Wuppertal / DE | 19.01.1990 | No. 02: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 23.01.1990 | No. 02: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 02.03.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.08.1990 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 03.09.1990 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1991/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 19.04.1989 | SE | 19.04.1989 | [1999/42] |
Former [1989/36] | SE | 19.04.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3707231 (BRADLEY WILLIAM E); | [A]DE2518614 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND); | [A]DE2704099 (BAXTER TRAVENOL LAB); | [A]DE2622461 (DIDIER WERKE AG) | Examination | EP0036315 | EP0037730 |