EP0086919 - Process for the selective removal of hydrogen sulfide from gaseous stream [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.1988 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.1988 [1988/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/35] | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Snavely, Earl Samuel, Jr. 2610 Oak CLiff Lane Arlington Texas 76012 / US | 02 /
Jones, Timothy Alan 3016 Cody Street Irving Texas 75062 / US | [1983/35] | Representative(s) | Cooper, John Anthony, et al Mobil Court 3 Clements Inn London WC2A 2EB / GB | [1987/05] |
Former [1983/35] | West, Alan Harry Mobil Court 3 Clements Inn London WC2A 2EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 82306861.4 | 22.12.1982 | [1983/35] | Priority number, date | US19820336796 | 04.01.1982 Original published format: US 336796 | US19820361947 | 25.03.1982 Original published format: US 361947 | [1983/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0086919 | Date: | 31.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0086919 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/36, B01D53/14, C01B17/05 | [1983/35] | CPC: |
B01D53/52 (EP);
C01B17/05 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur selektiven Entfernung von Schwefelwasserstoff aus einem strömenden Gas | [1983/35] | English: | Process for the selective removal of hydrogen sulfide from gaseous stream | [1983/35] | French: | Procédé pour l'élimination sélective d'hydrogène sulfuré de courants gazeux | [1983/35] | Examination procedure | 02.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/15] | 18.12.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP86201907.2 / EP0243542 | Opposition(s) | 17.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/35] | Request for further processing for: | 05.10.1985 | Request for further processing filed | 05.10.1985 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4036942 ; | [A]EP0005572 ; | [AP]US4332781 ; | [A]GB1379624 |