EP0056747 - Anemometer pole for measuring the relative speed between a fluid and a support, especially for an aircraft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.1986 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FGP INSTRUMENTATION 84 rue Henri Prou F-78340 Les-Clayes-Sous-Bois / FR | [1982/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gibert, Francis, Jean-Paul Chemin de Basse Boissière CR3 Les Mesnuls F-78490 Montfort L'Amaury / FR | [1982/30] | Representative(s) | Arnaud, Jean Lerner et Associés, 5, rue Jules Lefèbvre 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/30] | Arnaud, Jean Pierre Alfred Cabinet Arnaud 94 rue Saint-Lazare F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 82400021.0 | 08.01.1982 | [1982/30] | Priority number, date | FR19810000186 | 08.01.1981 Original published format: FR 8100186 | [1982/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0056747 | Date: | 28.07.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0056747 | Date: | 14.08.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G01L19/02, G01P5/165 | [1982/30] | CPC: |
G01L19/02 (EP,US);
G01P5/165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1982/30] | Title | German: | Windmessender Mast für die Bestimmung der Relativgeschwindigkeit zwischen einem fliessfähigen Medium und einem Träger, insbesondere für ein Luftfahrzeug | [1982/30] | English: | Anemometer pole for measuring the relative speed between a fluid and a support, especially for an aircraft | [1982/30] | French: | Mât anémométrique pour la détermination de la vitesse relative d'un fluide et d'un support, notamment pour aéronef | [1982/30] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 27.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/16] | 13.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1985 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   13.04.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 14.08.1985 | NL | 14.08.1985 | SE | 30.08.1985 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 14.08.1985 | |
NL | 14.08.1985 | ||
SE | 30.08.1985 | ||
Former [1988/13] | NL | 14.08.1985 | |
SE | 30.08.1985 | ||
Former [1986/32] | NL | 14.08.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE628410 (WALTER FINDEISEN DR); | [Y]DE706862 (E H DR PHIL H C ERNST HEINKEL); | [YD]GB699939 (HOPPE HANS); | [A]US3034353 (ANDERSON GORDON F); | [YD]GB1418970 (CAHILL OBRIEN T) |