EP0058100 - Process for preparing hydroxybenzaldehydes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1985 [1985/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE FRANCAISE HOECHST Société anonyme dite: 3, avenue du Général de Gaulle 92800 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/33] | For all designated states SOCIETE FRANCAISE HOECHST Société anonyme dite: 3, avenue du Général de Gaulle F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Christidis, Yani 12, Rue de Constantinople F-75008 Paris / FR | 02 /
Vallejos, Jean-Claude 9, Rue Labat F-75018 Paris / FR | [1982/33] | Representative(s) | Rinuy, Guy, et al Cabinet Rinuy, Santarelli 14, Avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/33] | Rinuy, Guy, et al Cabinet Rinuy et Santarelli 14, Avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 82400064.0 | 14.01.1982 | [1982/33] | Priority number, date | FR19810000967 | 20.01.1981 Original published format: FR 8100967 | [1982/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0058100 | Date: | 18.08.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0058100 | Date: | 27.12.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07C47/565, C07C47/575, C07C65/30, C07D317/64, C07C45/38, // C07C47/58 | [1982/33] | CPC: |
C07C45/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1982/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Hydroxybenzaldehyden | [1982/33] | English: | Process for preparing hydroxybenzaldehydes | [1982/33] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'hydroxybenzaldéhydes | [1982/33] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/13] | 21.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.06.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3673257 (BELLA EUGENE P DI) | [A] - Monatshefte fur Chemie, Vol. 103, No. 4, 1972 Vienne, AT P. CLAUS et al.: "Darstellung und Oxydation von Hydroxybenzylal-koholen", pages 1178-1193 |