EP0057648 - Method and device for the inspection of nuclear reactor control rods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Fiat 1 place de la Coupole F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/32] | For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Fiat 1 place de la Coupole F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gravelle, Alain 39 rue Amédée Usseglio F-92350 Le Plessis Robinson / FR | 02 /
Marini, Jean Chemin du Bois Martin F-78160 Marly le Roi / FR | 03 /
Romy, Dominique 14 Rue du Roy Gontran F-71100 Chalon-Sur-Saone / FR | [1982/32] | Representative(s) | Lavoix, Jean, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place D'Estienne D'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [1985/07] |
Former [1982/32] | Le Brusque, Maurice CREUSOT-LOIRE 15 rue Pasquier F-75383 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 82400183.8 | 04.02.1982 | [1982/32] | Priority number, date | FR19810002096 | 04.02.1981 Original published format: FR 8102096 | [1982/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0057648 | Date: | 11.08.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0057648 | Date: | 27.12.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G21C17/12 | [1982/32] | CPC: |
G21C17/12 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Überwachung von Regelstäben eines Kernreaktors | [1982/32] | English: | Method and device for the inspection of nuclear reactor control rods | [1982/32] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de surveillance du déplacement des barres de contrôle d'un réacteur nucléaire | [1982/32] | Examination procedure | 13.09.1982 | Examination requested [1982/47] | 02.03.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.06.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2350578 [ ] (DIAMOND POWER SPECIALITY [US]); | FR2407456 [ ] (NIKOLAEV VLADIMIR [SU]); | DE1464791 [ ] (ATOMENERGIE AB); | FR2135340 [ ] (LICENTIA GMBH); | FR1514156 [ ] (REALISATIONS ULTRASONIQUES SA); | US4090407 [ ] (SHULER COBIA B, et al); | FR2447030 [ ] (UPJOHN CO [US]) |