EP0060735 - Anchoring device for the end of a conduit with a slidable inner control cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.1985 [1985/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE ANONYME D.B.A. Centre Paris Pleyel F-93521 St-Denis Cédex 01 / FR | [1982/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deligny, Jean 132, rue du Villaret F-72000 Le Mans / FR | [1982/38] | Representative(s) | Poidatz, Emmanuel, et al Conseil en Propriété Industrielle, 96, Boulevard Malesherbes 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/38] | Poidatz, Emmanuel, et al Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 82400189.5 | 04.02.1982 | [1982/38] | Priority number, date | FR19810003947 | 27.02.1981 Original published format: FR 8103947 | [1982/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0060735 | Date: | 22.09.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0060735 | Date: | 28.11.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F16C1/22 | [1982/38] | CPC: |
F16C1/226 (EP,US);
F16C1/262 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20408 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1982/38] | Title | German: | Befestigungsvorrichtung des Endstücks einer Führungshülle eines verschiebbaren Bedienungskabels | [1982/38] | English: | Anchoring device for the end of a conduit with a slidable inner control cable | [1982/38] | French: | Dispositif de fixation sur une paroi de l'extrémité d'une gaine dans laquelle est reçu coulissant un câble de commande | [1982/38] | Examination procedure | 16.02.1982 | Examination requested [1982/38] | 14.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0030494 [ ] (DBA SA [FR]); | US2730134 [ ] (MORSE JOHN F); | FR2375489 [ ] (BORG WARNER [US]) |