EP0058611 - Machine for applying a liquid for the treatment or destruction of plants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.1984 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.1984 [1984/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rives, Gérard 37 Chemin de la Ségognole Noisy sur Ecole F-77123 Le Vaudoue / FR | [1982/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/34] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1984/29] |
Former [1982/34] | Barnay, André François, et al Cabinet Barnay 72, rue d'Hauteville B.P. 171 F-75463 Paris Cédex 10 / FR | Application number, filing date | 82400244.8 | 11.02.1982 | [1982/34] | Priority number, date | FR19810003049 | 17.02.1981 Original published format: FR 8103049 | [1982/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0058611 | Date: | 25.08.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A01M21/04 | [1982/34] | CPC: |
A01M21/043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/34] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Aufbringen von Flüssigkeiten zur Behandlung oder Vernichtung von Pflanzen | [1982/34] | English: | Machine for applying a liquid for the treatment or destruction of plants | [1982/34] | French: | Dispositif d'application d'un liquide pour le traitement ou la destruction de végétaux | [1982/34] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 11.02.1982 | Examination requested [1982/34] | 28.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/43] | 16.05.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1984/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.1984 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US1368123 [ ] (DONALDSON SAMUEL A); | US1764952 [ ] (HAY CLARENCE B); | US3021642 [ ] (EWING BERNARD E); | US3232006 [ ] (ATHERTON ROY L, et al); | US3257753 [ ] (MAURICE ZENNIE MICHAEL); | GB1508709 [ ] (CORBEIL ETUDES CONST MEC); | US4219964 [ ] (DALE JIM E [US]); | US4223478 [ ] (MCHUGH DENNIS P) |