Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0060180 | Global Dossier | 15.09.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8104537 | 06.03.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1197122 | 26.11.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8104537 | 06.03.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2501382 | 29.03.1985 | B1 | FR2501382 | 10.09.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8104537 | 06.03.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS57161703 | 05.10.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8104537 | 06.03.1981 |