EP0060180 - Cable element and fibre-optical cable resistent against high tensions and/or elevated pressures, and process for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.1986 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIGNES TELEGRAPHIQUES ET TELEPHONIQUES L.T.T. 1, rue Charles Bourseul F-78702 Conflans-Ste-Honorine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/37] | For all designated states LIGNES TELEGRAPHIQUES ET TELEPHONIQUES L.T.T. 1, rue Charles Bourseul F-78702 Conflans-Ste-Honorine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hulin, Jean-Pierre THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 02 /
Staath, Jean-Claude THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 03 /
de Vecchis, Michel THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1982/37] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/16] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | ||
Former [1982/37] | Jacquard, Philippe THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 82400342.0 | 26.02.1982 | [1982/37] | Priority number, date | FR19810004537 | 06.03.1981 Original published format: FR 8104537 | [1982/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0060180 | Date: | 15.09.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/16, G02B5/172, H01B13/00 | [1982/37] | CPC: |
G02B6/449 (EP);
G02B6/4413 (EP);
G02B6/4427 (EP);
G02B6/4491 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [1982/37] | Title | German: | Kabelelement und faseroptisches Kabel, hauptsächlich widerstandsfähig gegen erhöhte Zug- und/oder Druckkräfte, und zugehöriges Herstellungsverfahren | [1982/37] | English: | Cable element and fibre-optical cable resistent against high tensions and/or elevated pressures, and process for its manufacture | [1982/37] | French: | Elément de câble et câble à fibres optiques, notamment susceptible de résister à des tractions et/ou à des pressions élevées, et son procédé de fabrication | [1982/37] | File destroyed: | 04.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 19.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/13] | 19.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.05.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/50] | 08.07.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1986/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2836314 ; | [A]GB2051398 ; | [A]DE2900302 ; | [A]FR2444282 ; | [A]US4154049 |