EP0065885 - Device for producing television pictures with a charge-transfer matrix [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.1985 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.1985 [1985/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1982/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Epsztein, Bernard THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 02 /
Guyot, Lucien THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1982/48] | Representative(s) | Mayeux, Michèle, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI 92045 Paris la Défense Cedex 67 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/48] | Mayeux, Michèle, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI F-92045 PARIS LA DEFENSE CEDEX 67 / FR | Application number, filing date | 82400461.8 | 12.03.1982 | [1982/48] | Priority number, date | FR19810006188 | 27.03.1981 Original published format: FR 8106188 | [1982/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0065885 | Date: | 01.12.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0065885 | Date: | 14.03.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/15 | [1982/48] | CPC: |
H04N23/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1983/52] |
Former [1982/48] | DE, GB, NL | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Erzeugung von Fernsehbildern mit einer Ladungsübertragungsmatrize | [1982/48] | English: | Device for producing television pictures with a charge-transfer matrix | [1982/48] | French: | Dispositif pour la production d'images télévisées, à matrice à transfert de charges | [1982/48] | Examination procedure | 09.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/08] | 21.07.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 31.08.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR797332 (FARNSWORTH TELEVISION INC); | [A]US4038690 (HOAGLAND KENNETH A) | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, vol. ED-20, no. 6, juin 1973, pages 535-540, New York (USA); |