EP0063968 - Installation and method for verifying the working conditions of a pressure and flow controlling device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBINETTERIE, S.F.R., S.A. 13 rue Jean Jacques Rousseau F-80390 Fressenneville / FR | [1982/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hendrick, Jean 7 rue M. Ravel F-80130 Friville-Escarbotin / FR | [1982/44] | Representative(s) | Ecrepont, Robert Cabinet Ecrepont 27bis, rue du Vieux-Faubourg 59800 Lille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/44] | Ecrepont, Robert Cabinet Ecrepont 12 Place Simon Vollant F-59800 Lille / FR | Application number, filing date | 82400516.9 | 23.03.1982 | [1982/44] | Priority number, date | FR19810007953 | 15.04.1981 Original published format: FR 8107953 | [1982/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0063968 | Date: | 03.11.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0063968 | Date: | 28.11.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F15B19/00, G01M19/00, G01M3/28, F16K17/06, F16K37/00 | [1982/44] | CPC: |
F15B19/005 (EP,US);
F16K17/06 (EP,US);
F16K37/0091 (EP,US);
G01M3/2876 (EP,US);
G01M99/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1982/44] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Überprüfen der Funktion eines Druck- und Strömungsüberwachungsgerätes | [1984/48] | English: | Installation and method for verifying the working conditions of a pressure and flow controlling device | [1982/44] | French: | Installation et procédé pour la vérification des conditions de fonctionnement d'un organe de contrôle de débit et de pression | [1982/44] |
Former [1982/44] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Prüfen des Funktionszustandes eines Druck- und Strömungsüberwachungsgerätes | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 19.10.1982 | Examination requested [1982/52] | 15.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.04.1982 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   26.05.1982 | 23.04.1982 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   26.05.1982 | 23.04.1982 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   26.05.1982 | 23.04.1982 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   26.05.1982 | 23.04.1982 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   26.05.1982 | 23.04.1982 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   26.05.1982 | 23.04.1982 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   26.05.1982 | 23.04.1982 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   26.05.1982 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 28.11.1984 | CH | 31.03.1985 | LI | 31.03.1985 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 28.11.1984 | |
CH | 31.03.1985 | ||
LI | 31.03.1985 | ||
Former [1989/19] | CH | 31.03.1985 | |
LI | 31.03.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2343179 (POCLAIN SA [FR]); | [Y]DE2801183 (RUHRKOHLE AG) | [Y] - OLHYDRAULIK UND PNEUMATIK, vol. 21, no. 1, janvier 1977, Mainz, DE, G. SCHEFFEL: "Prüfstand und Versuchsventil für stationäre und dynamische Ventiluntersuchungen", pages 28-31 | [A] - HYDRAULICS & PNEUMATICS, vol. 30, no. 7, juillet 1977, Cleveland, US, T.T. EVANS: "Hydraulic test stand solves maintenance problems", pages 91-93 |