EP0061409 - Electrically movable sliding window equipped with a safety detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.1985 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.1985 [1985/49] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
FR
GB
IT
SE
SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE INTERNATIONAL "Les Miroirs" 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | For:DE
VEGLA Vereinigte Glaswerke GmbH Viktoriaallee 3-5 52066 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/22] | For:BE
FR
GB
IT
SE
SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE INTERNATIONAL "Les Miroirs" 18, avenue d'Alsace F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
For:DE
VEGLA Vereinigte Glaswerke GmbH Viktoriaallee 3-5 D-52066 Aachen / DE | |||
Former [1982/39] | For:BE
FR
GB
IT
SE
SAINT-GOBAIN VITRAGE Les Miroirs 18, avenue d'Alsace F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
For:DE
VEGLA Vereinigte Glaswerke GmbH Viktoriaallee 3-5 D-52066 Aachen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sauer, Gerd Heinrich Hamacher Weg 11 D-5120 Stolberg-Venwegen / DE | 02 /
Unbehaun, Dieter Kobergerstrasse 58 D-8500 Nuernberg / DE | [1982/39] | Representative(s) | Breton, Jean-Claude, et al SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/39] | Breton, Jean-Claude, et al SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc F-93300 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 82400541.7 | 25.03.1982 | [1982/39] | Priority number, date | DE19813111696 | 25.03.1981 Original published format: DE 3111696 | [1982/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0061409 | Date: | 29.09.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0061409 | Date: | 05.12.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B60J1/17, E05F15/00, H03K17/955 | [1982/39] | CPC: |
H03K17/955 (EP,US);
B60J1/17 (EP,US);
E05F15/46 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/538 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1982/39] | Title | German: | Elektrisch bewegtes, mit einem Sicherheitsdetektor ausgestattetes Schiebefenster | [1982/39] | English: | Electrically movable sliding window equipped with a safety detector | [1982/39] | French: | Vitre coulissante, mue électriquement, et munie d'un détecteur de sécurité | [1982/39] | Examination procedure | 10.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/20] | 03.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1690298 [ ] (TRIPLEX SAFETY GLASS CO); | FR2073975 [ ] (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD, et al); | US3641389 [ ] (LEIDIGH WILLIAM J); | EP0026719 [ ] (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]); | DE2939942 [ ] (FHN VERBINDUNGSTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) | Examination | US3651389 |