blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0064889

EP0064889 - Machines for shaping shoe stiffeners [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.06.1986
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.1986No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.08.1986 [1986/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ANVER (Société anonyme française dite)
2, 6 rue Suchet
F-94701 Maisons-Alfort / FR
[1982/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Bichet, Lucien
16 bis rue du Plateau
F-91210 Draveil / FR
[1982/46]
Representative(s)Cuer, André
CABINET CUER 30, rue de Léningrad
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1982/46]Cuer, André
CABINET CUER 30, rue de Léningrad
F-75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date82400586.231.03.1982
[1982/46]
Priority number, dateFR1981000884305.05.1981         Original published format: FR 8108843
[1982/46]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0064889
Date:17.11.1982
Language:FR
[1982/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0064889
Date:28.03.1984
Language:FR
[1984/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0064889
Date:21.08.1985
Language:FR
[1985/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.1984
ClassificationIPC:A43D11/14
[1982/46]
CPC:
A43D11/12 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   GB,   IT [1982/46]
TitleGerman:Maschinen zum Formen von Schuhkappen[1982/46]
English:Machines for shaping shoe stiffeners[1982/46]
French:Perfectionnements aux machines à galber les contreforts de chaussures[1982/46]
Examination procedure02.04.1984Examination requested  [1984/24]
25.01.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
11.02.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.1985Fee for grant paid
27.03.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.05.1986No opposition filed within time limit [1986/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2055036  (SIFSA);
 [A]GB2033730  (BRITISH UNITED SHOE MACHINERY)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.