Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0063086 | Global Dossier | 26.02.1986 | B1 | EP0063086 | 20.10.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP5678381 | 15.04.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3269303D1 | 03.04.1986 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP5678381 | 15.04.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS57170268 | 20.10.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | JP5678381 | 15.04.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4461492 | 24.07.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | JP5678381 | 15.04.1981 |