EP0063086 - Seat belt assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.1987 [1987/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/05] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
Former [1982/42] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY, LIMITED 2, Takra-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiroyuki, Miki c/o Nissan Motor Company, Limited Tsurumi Plant 6-1 Daikoku-cho Tsurumi-ku Yokohama City / JP | [1982/42] | Representative(s) | Beauchamps, Georges, et al Cabinet Weinstein 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/42] | Beauchamps, Georges, et al Cabinet Z.Weinstein 20, avenue de Friedland F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 82400662.1 | 13.04.1982 | [1982/42] | Priority number, date | JP19810056783 | 15.04.1981 Original published format: JP 5678381 | [1982/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0063086 | Date: | 20.10.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0063086 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/00 | [1986/09] | CPC: |
B60R22/04 (EP,US);
B60R22/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1982/42] | B60R21/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/42] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsgurteinrichtung | [1982/42] | English: | Seat belt assembly | [1982/42] | French: | Agencement de ceinture de sécurité | [1982/42] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 21.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/42] | 11.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0022468 (ALLIED CORP [US]); | [Y]FR2070602 (FERODO SA); | [Y]FR2070601 (FERODO SA); | [A]DE1557535 (UNION SILS VAN DE LOO & CO) | [A] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, no. 129, January 1975, page 6. | Examination | GB1323583 |