EP0065919 - Holder for an inked or self inking stamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1986 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.1986 [1986/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE NOUVELLE TERSERAM-MEGRAS 42, Avenue Aubert F-94300 Vincennes / FR | [1982/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Verdenne, Jean 123, rue de Reuilly F-75012 Paris / FR | [1982/48] | Representative(s) | Armengaud Ainé, Charles Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3, Avenue Bugeaud F-75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/48] | Armengaud, Charles Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3, Avenue Bugeaud F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 82400913.8 | 17.05.1982 | [1982/48] | Priority number, date | FR19810010336 | 25.05.1981 Original published format: FR 8110336 | [1982/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0065919 | Date: | 01.12.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0065919 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B41K1/02 | [1982/48] | CPC: |
B41K1/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/48] | Title | German: | Halter für gefärbte Stempel oder Selbstfärbestempel | [1982/48] | English: | Holder for an inked or self inking stamp | [1982/48] | French: | Support de timbre, à encrage, ou auto-encré | [1982/48] | Examination procedure | 02.02.1983 | Examination requested [1983/16] | 10.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE35964 ; | [A]DE29527 |