EP0069604 - Hydraulic pumps or motors with helicoidal gears (screw turbines) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.1985 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.1985 [1985/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Girette, Bernard Manoir Imaginoire Chézy en Orxois F-02810 Gandelu / FR | [1983/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/02] | Representative(s) | Loyer, Yves, et al CABINET PIERRE LOYER 18, rue de Mogador F-75009 Paris / FR | [1983/02] | Application number, filing date | 82400972.4 | 26.05.1982 | [1983/02] | Priority number, date | FR19810010781 | 01.06.1981 Original published format: FR 8110781 | [1983/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0069604 | Date: | 12.01.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F04C2/107 | [1983/02] | CPC: |
F04C2/1071 (EP);
F04C11/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/02] | Title | German: | Verbesserungen an hydraulischen Pumpen oder Motoren mit Schneckenartigen Zahnrädern (Schneckenturbinen) | [1983/02] | English: | Hydraulic pumps or motors with helicoidal gears (screw turbines) | [1983/02] | French: | Perfectionnements aux pompes ou moteurs hydrauliques à engrenages hélicoidaux (turbines à vis) | [1983/02] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 31.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/16] | 05.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/29] | 07.02.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1373732 ; | [AD]FR787711 ; | [A]FR2384136 ; | [A]DE2715576 |