Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0068925
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
28.09.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] |
03.09.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
23.06.1987 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.08.1987 [1987/33] |
09.04.1987 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.1987 [1987/22] |
05.07.1986 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.08.1986 [1986/34] |
07.05.1986 |
Change - applicant |
published on 25.06.1986 [1986/26] |
07.05.1986 |
Change - representative |
published on 25.06.1986 [1986/26] |
11.08.1984 |
Change - applicant |
published on 17.10.1984 [1984/42] |
14.02.1983 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.04.1983 [1983/16] |
05.11.1982 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.01.1983 [1983/01] |