Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE21587T | 15.09.1986 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP82400976 | 26.05.1982 | FR8111594 | 12.06.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0068925 | Global Dossier | 20.08.1986 | B1 | EP0068925 | 05.01.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8111594 | 12.06.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3272704D1 | 25.09.1986 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR8111594 | 12.06.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2507828 | 02.12.1983 | B1 | FR2507828 | 17.12.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8111594 | 12.06.1981 |