EP0072275 - Diaphragm pump for a vacuum free of oil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evrard, Robert 5 rue Carnot F-95690 Nesles la Vallee / FR | [1983/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/07] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1985/11] |
Former [1983/07] | Bouget, Lucien CREUSOT-LOIRE 15 rue Pasquier F-75383 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 82401332.0 | 16.07.1982 | [1983/07] | Priority number, date | FR19810014489 | 24.07.1981 Original published format: FR 8114489 | [1983/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0072275 | Date: | 16.02.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0072275 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F04B45/04, F04B45/06, F04B37/14 | [1983/07] | CPC: |
F04B45/0736 (EP,US);
F04B37/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/07] | Title | German: | Membranpumpe für ölfreies Vakuum | [1983/07] | English: | Diaphragm pump for a vacuum free of oil | [1983/07] | French: | Pompe à vide sèche à membrane | [1983/07] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 29.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/40] | 17.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1985 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.01.1986 | 31.07.1986 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.04.1987 | IT | 29.04.1987 | NL | 29.04.1987 | SE | 30.04.1987 | CH | 31.07.1987 | LI | 31.07.1987 | LU | 31.07.1987 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 29.04.1987 | |
IT | 29.04.1987 | ||
NL | 29.04.1987 | ||
SE | 30.04.1987 | ||
CH | 31.07.1987 | ||
LI | 31.07.1987 | ||
LU | 31.07.1987 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 29.04.1987 | |
IT | 29.04.1987 | ||
NL | 29.04.1987 | ||
SE | 30.04.1987 | ||
CH | 31.07.1987 | ||
LI | 31.07.1987 | ||
Former [1989/25] | AT | 29.04.1987 | |
NL | 29.04.1987 | ||
SE | 30.04.1987 | ||
CH | 31.07.1987 | ||
LI | 31.07.1987 | ||
Former [1989/18] | AT | 29.04.1987 | |
NL | 29.04.1987 | ||
SE | 30.04.1987 | ||
Former [1989/12] | AT | 29.04.1987 | |
NL | 29.04.1987 | ||
Former [1988/51] | NL | 29.04.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE203854 ; | [A]FR581223 ; | [A]FR689893 ; | [A]US2494529 (WIRTANEN AXEL M); | [A]CH284883 (OERLIKON MASCHF [CH]) |