Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE22692T | 15.10.1986 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP82401459 | 03.08.1982 | US28967181 | 03.08.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4432971 | 21.02.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | US28967181 | 03.08.1981 | US39297782 | 28.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4432972 | 21.02.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | US45341182 | 27.12.1982 | US28967181 | 03.08.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0071544 | Global Dossier | 08.10.1986 | B1 | EP0071544 | 09.02.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US28967181 | 03.08.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1276392 | 13.11.1990 | C | Priority number | Date | US28967181 | 03.08.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3273628D1 | 13.11.1986 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US28967181 | 03.08.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0354116B | 19.08.1991 | B2 | JPS5838294 | 05.03.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | US28967181 | 03.08.1981 |